Jeannine Widmer
domiciled in Thun, from Zurzach Active mandates: FP Finances Publiques AG, Abplanalp-Ramsauer AG Connected persons: Jacqueline Rupf, Martin Frey, Anita Berger-Pfeuti and more You can stay up to date through "Jeannine Widmer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jeannine Widmer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jeannine Widmer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jeannine Widmer"
|
|
Jeannine Widmer
domiciled in Steinhausen, from Gränichen Active mandates: Nepal-Stiftung Therese Huser Connected persons: Marielle Tétaz, Antonia Christen Berchtold You can stay up to date through "Jeannine Widmer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jeannine Widmer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jeannine Widmer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jeannine Widmer"
|
Places where people with the name Jeannine Widmer live
Sectors in which people with the name Jeannine Widmer work
Fiduciary services
Other Business-to-Business services
Other social services
Fiduciary services
Other Business-to-Business services
Other social services
Private persons with the name Jeannine Widmer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jeannine Widmer
Publication number: HR02-1005978745, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Nepal-Stiftung Therese Huser, in Zug, CHE-378.744.677, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2023, Publ. 1005823739).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Widmer, Jeannine, von Gränichen, in Steinhausen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004966673, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
FP Finances Publiques AG, in Bowil, CHE-109.865.231, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2019, Publ. 1004573695).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
RZ TREUHAND Pascal Chevalier (CHE-102.299.767), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle;
Berdat, Francis, von Moosseedorf und Courroux, in Diemerswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Büschi, Beat, von Kriechenwil, in Oberwangen b. Bern (Köniz), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stamm, Erich, von Schleitheim, in Huttwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frey, Martin, von Münsingen, in Mühlethurnen (Thurnen), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Widmer, Jeannine, von Bad Zurzach, in Thun, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
RZ Treuhand AG (CHE-352.365.611), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle;
Rupf, Jacqueline, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Gasel (Köniz), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2578119, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Abplanalp-Ramsauer AG, in Bowil, CHE-105.588.179, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 04.11.2013, Publ. 1159743). [Streichung der Bemerkung betreffend Verzicht auf eine eingeschränkte Revision infolge Wahl einer Revisionsstelle.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 15.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Widmer, Jeannine, von Bad Zurzach, in Thun, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
RZ TREUHAND Pascal Chevalier ( CHE-102.299.767), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle;
Fankhauser, Johann, genannt Hannes, von Trub, in Heimiswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Habegger, Sandro Dominic, von Trub, in Biglen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.