Kurt Walser
domiciled in Uster, from Herisau Active mandates: Walser-Treuhand Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
|
|
Kurt Walser
domiciled in Tosters-Feldkirch, from Austria Active mandates: Walser CNC Mechanik AG in Liquidation Connected persons: Jürg Schmid You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
|
|
Kurt Walser
domiciled in Gais, from Gais Active mandates: Raiffeisen Schweiz Genossenschaft Connected persons: Oliver Gerstlauer, Natascha Retzler-Tavoletta, Grégoire Lenglet and more You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
|
|
Kurt Walser
domiciled in Unterterzen, from Quarten Active mandates: Auto Walser AG, Wangs, WAWAG Immo AG and more Connected persons: Kevin Schlegel, Hannes Luzius Mader, Rainer Mader and more You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kurt Walser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kurt Walser"
|
Places where people with the name Kurt Walser live
Sectors in which people with the name Kurt Walser work
Fiduciary services
Manufacturing of tool machinery
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Fiduciary services
Manufacturing of tool machinery
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Kurt Walser
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Kurt Walser
Publication number: HR02-1005773590, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
AUTO-GRAF AG, in Meilen, CHE-105.930.800, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2022, Publ. 1005520346).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Kurt, von Herisau, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004930893, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Auto Walser AG, Wangs, in Vilters-Wangs, CHE-114.069.004, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 24.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2059859).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Felix, von Quarten, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mader, Rainer, von Flums, in Walenstadt, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Walser, Kurt, von Quarten, in Unterterzen (Quarten), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Mader, Hannes Luzius, von Flums, in Flums Hochwiese (Flums), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR03-1004813122, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Hartmann Müller-Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-109.411.350, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2946729). Die Stiftung wurde gemäss Urteil des Bezirksgerichts Zürich vom 01.11.2017 aufgehoben. Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Stiftung wird gelöscht.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Walser, Kurt, von Altstätten, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].