Josef von Rotz
domiciled in Hombrechtikon, from Kerns Active mandates: fenaco Genossenschaft Connected persons: Johanna Maeva Gapany, Andrea-Sandra Neuenschwnader, Christian Saglini and more You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
|
|
Josef von Rotz
domiciled in Sarnen, from Kerns Active mandates: von Rotz Josef Connected persons: Vreni von Rotz-Gasser You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
|
|
Josef von Rotz
domiciled in Founex, from Kerns Active mandates: MESA Etter Marcel SA Connected persons: Jean-Pierre Etter, Marcel Etter You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
|
|
Josef von Rotz
domiciled in Kerns, from Kerns Active mandates: Josef von Rotz Transporte GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: Heidi von Rotz-Britschgi You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Josef von Rotz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Josef von Rotz"
|
Places where people with the name Josef von Rotz live
Sectors in which people with the name Josef von Rotz work
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Production and processing of wooden goods
BranchCode_n/a
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Production and processing of wooden goods
BranchCode_n/a
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Private persons with the name Josef von Rotz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Josef von Rotz
Publication number: HR02-1005612840, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Josef von Rotz Transporte GmbH, in Kerns, CHE-108.650.751, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 05.08.2009, S.13, Publ. 5181076).
Firma neu:
Josef von Rotz Transporte GmbH in Liquidation.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse:, Flüelistrasse 38, 6064 Kerns. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der ausserordentlichen Gesellschafterversammlung vom 18.11.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Rotz, Josef, von Kerns, in Kerns, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005516145, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Swiss Grana Group AG, in Bern, CHE-114.319.715, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2022, Publ. 1005421070).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reiss, Hansjörg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lörrach (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Rotz, Josef, von Kerns, in Hombrechtikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1294341, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
RL Allround-Schreiner GmbH, in Alpnach, CHE-108.648.932, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 04.07.2008, S. 20, Publ. 4559518).
Domizil neu:
Sattelstrasse 5, 6055 Alpnach Dorf, [behördliche Umadressierung].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Rotz, Josef, von Kerns, in Kerns, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Langensand, Rudolf, von Alpnach, in Alpnach Dorf (Alpnach), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Alpnach und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00].