Adrian Markus Vogel
domiciled in Hergiswil, from Horw Active mandates: Vogel Real Estate AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Adrian Markus Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Adrian Markus Vogel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Adrian Markus Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Adrian Markus Vogel"
|
Places where people with the name Adrian Markus Vogel live
Sectors in which people with the name Adrian Markus Vogel work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Adrian Markus Vogel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Adrian Markus Vogel
Publication number: HR02-1005968011, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Vogel Real Estate AG, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-240.855.345, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 04.12.2023, Publ. 1005899827).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vogel, Adrian, von Horw, in Hergiswil (NW), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Stansstad].
Publication number: HR02-1005899827, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Vogel Real Estate AG, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-240.855.345, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 08.12.2021, Publ. 1005351993).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Kornelia Rosel, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hergiswil (NW), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vogel, Adrian, von Horw, in Stansstad, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005780084, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
CC3 GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-291.376.687, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2020, Publ. 1004978698).
Statutenänderung:
20.06.2023.
Sitz neu:
Ebikon.
Domizil neu:
Luzernerstrasse 59d, 6030 Ebikon.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Givel, Roger Raymond, von Payerne, in Hergiswil (NW), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00;
Vogel, Adrian Markus, von Horw, in Hergiswil (NW), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 50 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Roeskens, Yves Stefan, von Kriens, in Ebikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00.