Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta
domiciled in Lugano, from Biasca Active mandates: Lify Sagl Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta"
|
Places where people with the name Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta live
Sectors in which people with the name Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta work
Services for banks and credit institutions
Services for banks and credit institutions
Private persons with the name Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Manuel Simone Pio Vanzetta
Publication number: HR02-1006020019, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Freename AG, in Wollerau, CHE-295.377.562, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2023, Publ. 1005868516).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vanzetta, Manuel Simone Pio, von Biasca, in Lugano, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Teodori, Riccardo, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in San Giljan (MT), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005838889, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Freename AG, in Wollerau, CHE-295.377.562, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2023, Publ. 1005811874).
Statutenänderung:
31.08.2023.
Aktien neu:
10'000'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Stammaktien) und 3'585'004 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Vorzugsaktien) [bisher: 2'473'904 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Vorzugsaktien) und 11'111'100 Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 (Stammaktien)].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vicini, Davide, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Chessé, Thibaut Antoine Gilbert Hyacinthe, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Paris (FR), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vanzetta, Manuel Simone Pio, von Biasca, in Lugano, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Russo, Antonio Giuseppe, von Mezzovico-Vira, in Sorengo, mit Einzelprokura [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005301360, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
VANZETTA GROUP SAGL, in Biasca, CHE-305.808.844, società a garanzia limitata (Nr. FUSC 166 del 27.08.2020, Pubbl. 1004966288).
Statuti modificati:
21.07.2021.
Nuova sede:
Mendrisio.
Nuovo recapito:
Via Carlo Cattaneo 2, 6850 Mendrisio.
Nuove comunicazioni:
Le comunicazioni della società ai soci si effettuano per lettera, fax o per email.
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Vanzetta, Manuel, da Biasca, in Biasca, socio e presidente della gerenza, con firma collettiva a due, con 10 quote da CHF 1'000.00;
Shala, Arber, da Biasca, in Bellinzona, socio e gerente, con firma collettiva a due, con 10 quote da CHF 1'000.00.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Palladino, Michele, cittadino italiano, in Mendrisio, socio e gerente, con firma individuale, con 20 quote da CHF 1'000.00.