Mehtap Uzuner
domiciled in Zürich, from Opfikon Active mandates: Prime Strategic GmbH, primeAD AG Connected persons: Yasin Uzuner, Yasin Uzuner You can stay up to date through "Mehtap Uzuner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mehtap Uzuner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Mehtap Uzuner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mehtap Uzuner"
|
Places where people with the name Mehtap Uzuner live
Sectors in which people with the name Mehtap Uzuner work
Fiduciary services
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Mehtap Uzuner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Mehtap Uzuner
Publication number: HR02-1005973772, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Prime Strategic GmbH, bisher in Wohlenschwil, CHE-235.944.552, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2024, Publ. 1005938046).
Statutenänderung:
24.01.2024. 07.02.2024.
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
Sinserstrasse 67, 6330 Cham. [gestrichen: Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.]. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Apaydin, Metin, von Oftringen, in Suhr, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Uzuner, Mehtap, von Opfikon, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10'000 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1.00;
Uzuner, Yasin, von Opfikon, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10'000 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005521597, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
primeAD AG, in Zürich, CHE-420.865.844, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 15.07.2019, Publ. 1004675253).
Domizil neu:
Schaffhauserstrasse 432, 8050 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Uzuner, Abisef, von Opfikon, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Uzuner, Mehtap, von Opfikon, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Uzuner, Yasin, von Opfikon, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.