Werner Ulrich
domiciled in Saillon, from Birrwil and Gland Active mandates: ADS Architecture du Sens Sàrl Connected persons: Christine Müller Ulrich You can stay up to date through "Werner Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Werner Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Ulrich"
|
|
Werner Ulrich
domiciled in Wolhusen, from Steinen Active mandates: SELESTA AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Werner Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Werner Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Ulrich"
|
Places where people with the name Werner Ulrich live
Sectors in which people with the name Werner Ulrich work
Other services in education
Fiduciary services
Other services in education
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Werner Ulrich
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Werner Ulrich
Publication number: HR02-1006026072, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Humanis AG Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-106.044.901, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 07.11.2023, Publ. 1005877949).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ulrich, Werner, von Zürich, in Volketswil, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006024411, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Ulrich Baumanagement GmbH, in Muotathal, CHE-291.239.814, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 17.04.2020, Publ. 1004872588).
Firma neu:
Ulrich Baumanagement GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 26.04.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulrich, Adolf Werner, genannt Werner, von Muotathal, in Muotathal, Gesellschafter, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 15 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005827980, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
"Sicheres Alter Thunbachtal", in Thundorf, CHE-104.199.680, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 12.11.2021, Publ. 1005333041).
Domizil neu:
Gehrenstrasse 4B, 8512 Thundorf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ulrich, Werner, von Stammheim, in Thundorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kern, Markus, von Winterthur, in Thundorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Schürch, Judith, von Schänis, in Thundorf, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.