Michael Ulrich
domiciled in Aristau, from Gersau Active mandates: Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft AG Connected persons: Tenzin Seldön Zotsang, Ladina Engel, Anup Kumar Nastik and more You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
|
|
Michael Ulrich
domiciled in Muotathal, from Muotathal Active mandates: MECHWERK AG Connected persons: Marcel Ruoss-Mäder, Beat Gwerder, Dino Conte You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
|
|
Michael Ulrich
domiciled in Cham, from Luzern and St. Antoni Active mandates: ImBild GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
|
|
Michael Ulrich
domiciled in Herzogenbuchsee, from Rüschegg Active mandates: Malergeschäft M. Ulrich Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
|
|
Michael Ulrich
domiciled in Lostorf, from Rickenbach (SO) Active mandates: Bolliger AG Radio & Television Connected persons: Daniela Ulrich, Peter von Burg You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Ulrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Ulrich"
|
Places where people with the name Michael Ulrich live
Sectors in which people with the name Michael Ulrich work
Operation of an insurance company
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Other services in education
Painter
Trading in IT and communications products
Operation of an insurance company
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Other services in education
Painter
Trading in IT and communications products
Private persons with the name Michael Ulrich
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Michael Ulrich
Publication number: 1484607, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Raiffeisenbank Muotathal Genossenschaft, in Muotathal, CHE-106.891.433, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2013, Publ. 1059257).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ulrich, Michael, von Muotathal, in Muotathal, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Betschart, Pius, von Muotathal, in Muotathal, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6851774, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
ImBild GmbH, in Buchrain, CH-100.4.028.622-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 09.10.2009, S. 12, Publ. 5285044).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulrich, Michael, von Luzern und St. Antoni, in Cham, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Buchrain].
Publication number: 5262440, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
ImBild GmbH, in Buchrain, CH-100.4.028.622-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2004, S. 8, Publ. 2532944).
Statutenänderung:
14.07.2009, 15.09.2009. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. [Weitere Aenderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 14.07.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Felder, Marcel, von Luzern, in Meggen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulrich, Michael, von Luzern und St. Antoni, in Buchrain, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen von je CHF 100.-- [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.--].