Flavio Mario Torti
domiciled in Reconvilier, from Stabio Active mandates: TFA Consulting Sàrl, Clos Jean Vernier SA en liquidation and more Connected persons: Jean-Claude René Liechti, Philippe Niederhäuser, Heinz Siegrist and more You can stay up to date through "Flavio Mario Torti", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Flavio Mario Torti"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Flavio Mario Torti", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Flavio Mario Torti"
|
Places where people with the name Flavio Mario Torti live
Sectors in which people with the name Flavio Mario Torti work
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of an pension fund
Associations and federations
Operation of other financial institutions
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Religious, political or secular associations
Road, railway and tunnel construction
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of an pension fund
Associations and federations
Operation of other financial institutions
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Religious, political or secular associations
Road, railway and tunnel construction
IT services
Private persons with the name Flavio Mario Torti
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Flavio Mario Torti
Publication number: HR02-1006054526, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
TFA Consulting Sàrl, à Reconvilier, CHE-109.569.241, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 48 du 10.03.2020, Publ. 1004848534).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Torti, Manuela, de Biel/Bienne et Stabio, à Aviles (ES), associée et présidente des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Torti, Flavio Mario, de Stabio, à Reconvilier, associé et président des gérants, avec signature individuelle, pour 20 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005967865, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
JCL Optimum Management SA, à Corgémont, CHE-107.382.275, société anonyme (No. FOSC 37 du 24.02.2009, p.5, Publ. 4895070).
Modification des statuts:
13.02.2024.
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par courrier écrit ou par courrier électronique.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Liechti, Jean-Claude, de Landiswil, à Corgémont, délégué du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur-délégué, avec signature individuelle];
König Liechti, Sandrine Dr., de Sierre et Landiswil, à Corgémont, présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: présidente, avec signature collective à deux];
Torti, Flavio, de Stabio, à Reconvilier, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux];
Scheidegger, Gérard, de Sumiswald, à Walperswil, directeur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005966712, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KL Groupe Holding S.A., à Corgémont, CHE-101.396.126, société anonyme (No. FOSC 130 du 08.07.2010, p.3, Publ. 5718006).
Modification des statuts:
13.02.2024.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
KL Groupe Holding SA.
Nouvelle traduction de la raison:
(KL Gruppe Holding AG) (KL Group Holding Corporation).
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par courrier écrit ou par courrier électronique.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
König Liechti, Sandrine Dr., de Sierre et Landiswil, à Corgémont, présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: présidente, avec signature collective à deux];
Torti, Flavio, de Stabio, à Reconvilier, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux];
Liechti, Jean-Claude, de Landiswil, à Corgémont, membre du conseil d'administration, délégué, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur-délégué, avec signature individuelle].