Verena Suter
domiciled in Mettmenstetten, from Mettmenstetten Active mandates: TV - Suter Connected persons: Ernst Suter You can stay up to date through "Verena Suter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Verena Suter"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Verena Suter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Verena Suter"
|
Places where people with the name Verena Suter live
Sectors in which people with the name Verena Suter work
Trading in IT and communications products
Trading in IT and communications products
Private persons with the name Verena Suter
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Verena Suter
Publication number: HR02-1005643644, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Dr. René Lottenbach AG, in Luzern, CHE-202.466.474, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 26.11.2019, Publ. 1004767969).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Verena, von Weggis, in Greppen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 4403637, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Dr. René Lottenbach AG, in Luzern, CHE-202.466.474, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2018, Publ. 4001691).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lottenbach, Dr. René, von Weggis, in Adligenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Lottenbach, Margrit, von Luzern, Weggis und Sempach, in Adligenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Macchi, Oskar Anton, von Luzern, in Weggis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Suter, Verena, von Weggis, in Greppen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3009515, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
BBS Beratung Bahn und Strasse AG, in Baden, CHE-110.177.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 14.11.2014, Publ. 1823255).
Statutenänderung:
28.07.2016.
Sitz neu:
Villnachern.
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 11, 5213 Villnachern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Hans-Jörg, von Gränichen, in Baden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Suter, Verena, von Gränichen, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Marco, von Gränichen, in Schinznach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Oberflachs, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].