Frank Stuhr
domiciled in Kürnbach, from Germany Active mandates: FLUXRON Solutions AG Connected persons: Gabriel Hauri, Johann Jäckle, Benno Jäckle and more You can stay up to date through "Frank Stuhr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Stuhr"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Frank Stuhr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Stuhr"
|
|
Frank Stuhr
domiciled in Eiken, from Rheinfelden Active mandates: Basellandschaftliche Kantonalbank Connected persons: Adrian Regenass, Miriam Sterk, Anitha Sivakumar and more You can stay up to date through "Frank Stuhr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Stuhr"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Frank Stuhr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Stuhr"
|
Places where people with the name Frank Stuhr live
Sectors in which people with the name Frank Stuhr work
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Private persons with the name Frank Stuhr
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Frank Stuhr
Publication number: 6805054, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
FLUXRON Solutions AG, bisher in Häggenschwil, CH-320.3.070.417-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6447836).
Gründungsstatuten:
15.11.2011.
Statutenänderung:
06.08.2012.
Sitz neu:
Amriswil.
Domizil neu:
Weinfelderstrasse 82, 8580 Amriswil.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jäckle, Benno, von Amriswil, in Lömmenschwil (Häggenschwil), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Heuberger, Roland, von Rickenbach TG, in Romanshorn, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stuhr, Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kürnbach (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Alpiger, Markus, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Wilen bei Wil (Wilen TG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wyss, Hans, von Brütten, in Weinfelden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6029634, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
E.G.O. Commercial Electronics AG, in Gossau SG, CH-300.3.012.402-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 01.07.2010, S. 19, Publ. 5703228).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stuhr, Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kürnbach (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jäckle, Benno, von Amriswil, in Lömmenschwil (Häggenschwil), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hörsting, Dr. Karlheinz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Karlsruhe (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5451600, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Hotelprojektentwicklung & Dienstleistungen, Stuhr, in Avers, CH-350.1.009.923-0, Haus 122, 7447 Cresta (Avers), Einzelunternehmen (Neueintragung).
Zweck:
Führen von Gastronomiebetrieben sowie Planung, Entwicklung und Umsetzung von Konzepten im Hotel- und Restaurationsbereich.
Eingetragene Personen:
Stuhr, Frank Rudolf genannt Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Cresta (Avers), Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift.