Marco Meinrad Studer
domiciled in Visp, from Visp Active mandates: Studer Söhne Asset AG, StuGa GmbH Connected persons: Meinrad Studer, Lothar Josef Studer, Lothar Josef Studer and more You can stay up to date through "Marco Meinrad Studer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Meinrad Studer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Meinrad Studer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Meinrad Studer"
|
Places where people with the name Marco Meinrad Studer live
Sectors in which people with the name Marco Meinrad Studer work
Services for banks and credit institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services for banks and credit institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Marco Meinrad Studer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marco Meinrad Studer
Publication number: HR02-1005239675, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Studer Söhne Elektro AG, in Visp, CHE-105.944.009, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 05.05.2020, Publ. 1004883449).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Marco Meinrad, von Visp, in Visp, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004883449, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Studer Söhne Elektro AG, in Visp, CHE-105.944.009, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2017, Publ. 3879905).
Statutenänderung:
22.04.2020. 29.04.2020. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer, Lothar Josef, von Visp, in Visp, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Studer, Marco Meinrad, von Visp, in Visp, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Studer-Lauber, Catherine Jacqueline, von Zermatt, in Visp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Studer Lothar Josef.
Publication number: HR02-1004883450, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Studer Söhne Immobilien AG, in Visp, CHE-316.976.121, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 02.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3199021).
Statutenänderung:
22.04.2020. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Marco Meinrad, von Visp, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer-Lauber, Catherine Jacqueline, von Zermatt, in Visp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.