Thomas Stirnimann
domiciled in Zürich, from Dietlikon and Zürich Active mandates: Camino Network Stiftung, Alpha Reisen AG Connected persons: Benjamin Usinger, Piotr Seweryn Wojtowicz, Beatrice Saudan-Steiner You can stay up to date through "Thomas Stirnimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Stirnimann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Stirnimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Stirnimann"
|
|
Thomas Stirnimann
domiciled in Emmenbrücke, from Rothenburg and Ruswil Active mandates: Stirnimann & Stirnimann Connected persons: Adelheid Sophie Stirnimann-Dormann You can stay up to date through "Thomas Stirnimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Stirnimann"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Thomas Stirnimann", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Thomas Stirnimann"
|
Places where people with the name Thomas Stirnimann live
Sectors in which people with the name Thomas Stirnimann work
IT services
Travel agency and tour operator services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
IT services
Travel agency and tour operator services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Thomas Stirnimann
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Thomas Stirnimann
Publication number: HR02-1005997282, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Soudronic AG, in Bergdietikon, CHE-105.956.805, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2023, Publ. 1005693754).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stirnimann, Thomas, von Büron, in Spreitenbach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fisch, Christian, von Speicher, in Hünenberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Kellenberger, Michel, von Dübendorf, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005860921, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MTCH AG, in Opfikon, CHE-103.628.247, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2023, Publ. 1005812618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stirnimann, Thomas, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bachmann, Tim, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kalt, Heinrich, von Leuggern, in Brugg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keckeisen, Anja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Repp, Eckhardt Uwe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Koppigen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005791064, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Chain4Travel AG, in Zug, CHE-364.921.803, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2023, Publ. 1005775201). [gestrichen: Mit Erklärung vom 17.12.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stirnimann, Thomas, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Blaser, Beat, von Langnau im Emmental, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
MBB Consulting GmbH (CHE-163.382.239), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.