Pascal Steingruber
domiciled in Zürich, from Schönengrund Active mandates: Topten GmbH, Bush Energie GmbH and more Connected persons: Charlotte Olivia Spörndli, Charlotte Olivia Spörndli, David Stickelberger and more You can stay up to date through "Pascal Steingruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pascal Steingruber"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pascal Steingruber", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pascal Steingruber"
|
Places where people with the name Pascal Steingruber live
Sectors in which people with the name Pascal Steingruber work
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Architectural and engineering activities
Legal counsel
Religious, political or secular associations
Operation of other financial institutions
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Architectural and engineering activities
Legal counsel
Religious, political or secular associations
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Pascal Steingruber
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pascal Steingruber
Publication number: HR02-1006120124, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Topten GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-100.899.956, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2018, Publ. 4014109).
Domizil neu:
Molkenstrasse 21, 8004 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bush, Dr. Eric Helmut, von Bern, in Felsberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spörndli, Charlotte, von Löhningen, in Basel, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Steingruber, Pascal, von Schönengrund, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1006069036, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Bush Energie GmbH, in Felsberg, CHE-108.393.809, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 07.01.2009, S.9, Publ. 4814330).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bush, Dr. Eric, von Bern, in Felsberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00;
Bush-Fontana, Barbara, von Flims, in Felsberg, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelprokura, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brandes Energie Holding AG (CHE-191.377.947), in Zürich, Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00;
Spörndli, Charlotte, von Löhningen, in Basel, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Steingruber, Pascal, von Schönengrund, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005839661, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
International Office European Energy Award GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-109.591.298, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 21.04.2022, Publ. 1005454872).
Firma neu:
International Office European Energy Award GmbH in Liquidation.
Domizil neu:
c/o Brandes Energie AG, Molkenstrasse 21, 8004 Zürich. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 08.09.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steingruber, Pascal, von Schönengrund, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].