Marcel Adrian Staub
domiciled in Feusisberg, from Ochlenberg Active mandates: blue8x AG, Carbitrage AG and more Connected persons: Max Ilmoni, Alex Wildhaber, Marc Oliver van den Berg and more You can stay up to date through "Marcel Adrian Staub", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Adrian Staub"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marcel Adrian Staub", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Adrian Staub"
|
Places where people with the name Marcel Adrian Staub live
Sectors in which people with the name Marcel Adrian Staub work
Services regarding management consulting
Car dealership
Trading in food products
Services for banks and credit institutions
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Car dealership
Trading in food products
Services for banks and credit institutions
IT services
Private persons with the name Marcel Adrian Staub
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marcel Adrian Staub
Publication number: HR02-1006124512, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
blue8x AG, in Zürich, CHE-298.027.006, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 18.07.2024, Publ. 1006087563).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Staub, Marcel Adrian, von Ochlenberg, in Feusisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005572339, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Novacar Zürichsee AG, bisher in Freienbach, CHE-454.383.632, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2022, Publ. 1005405777).
Statutenänderung:
06.09.2022.
Firma neu:
Carbitrage AG.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Voltastrasse 1, 8044 Zürich.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Staub, Marcel Adrian, von Ochlenberg, in Feusisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Pfäffikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Liechti, Fabian, von Eggiwil, in London (GB), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005345488, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
CocoSana GmbH, in Baar, CHE-381.621.319, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2019, Publ. 1004677825).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sourlas, Maria, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Staub, Marcel, von Ochlenberg, in Altendorf, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Liechti, Fabian, von Eggiwil, in London (GB), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Reinach (BL)].