Reto Spörri
domiciled in Zürich, from Zürich Active mandates: Ludic GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
|
|
Reto Spörri
domiciled in Wettingen, from Wettingen Active mandates: swala.ch GmbH, swala.ch - spörri's warenlager Connected persons: Natascha Leu You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
|
|
Reto Spörri
domiciled in Jona, from Reichenburg Active mandates: Zürichsee Baumanagement GmbH Connected persons: Alois Ferdinand Spörri You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
|
|
Reto Spörri
domiciled in Ermensee, from Hitzkirch Active mandates: Kapellenstiftung Ermensee Connected persons: Judith Emmenegger-Sperisen, Silvia Weibel-Brunner, Daniel Unternährer and more You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Reto Spörri", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Reto Spörri"
|
Places where people with the name Reto Spörri live
Sectors in which people with the name Reto Spörri work
IT services
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Architectural and engineering activities
Forest cultivation and management
IT services
Mail order and retail e-commerce
Architectural and engineering activities
Forest cultivation and management
Private persons with the name Reto Spörri
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Reto Spörri
Publication number: HR02-1005880765, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Mentar Holding AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-328.145.150, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 28.07.2021, Publ. 1005259469).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spörri, Reto, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vaucher-de-la-Croix, Claude-Alain, von Val-de-Travers, in Inwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005737471, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Ludic GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-293.689.720, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 04.09.2020, Publ. 1004971496).
Firma neu:
Ludic GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 20.04.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spörri, Reto, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005733351, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Kapellenstiftung Ermensee, in Ermensee, CHE-287.720.190, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2017, Publ. 3404751).
Domizil neu:
c/o Reto Spörri, Mühlestrasse 8, 6294 Ermensee.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Elmiger, Franz Josef, von Hitzkirch, in Ermensee, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rölli, Rita, von Ebersecken, in Ermensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassierin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schmitz, Stefan, von Emmen, in Hitzkirch, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spörri, Reto, von Hitzkirch, in Ermensee, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Weibel-Brunner, Silvia, von Hitzkirch, Schongau und Auw, in Ermensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Andreas, von Ermensee, in Ermensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Unternährer, Daniel, von Root und Romoos, in Schongau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Elmiger-Rohrer, Susanna, von Ermensee und Sachseln, in Ermensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Ermensee, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].