Stefan Simon
domiciled in Kerns, from Germany Active mandates: Sustainable Development Holding AG, Stiftung Montessori-Schule and more Connected persons: Thomas Spindler, Mark Bünger, Livius Fordschmid and more You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
|
|
Stefan Simon
domiciled in Zürich, from Schönenbuch Active mandates: Bank Vontobel AG Connected persons: Maryna Chernova, Luca Krebs, Sabrina Melanie Künzli and more You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
|
|
Stefan Simon
domiciled in Bäretswil, from Germany Active mandates: Unsere GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: Robert Straub, Ulla Straub You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Simon", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Simon"
|
Places where people with the name Stefan Simon live
Sectors in which people with the name Stefan Simon work
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of primary schools
Services regarding management consulting
Electrical power production and utilities
Operation of investment companies
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Operation of holiday cottages
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of primary schools
Services regarding management consulting
Electrical power production and utilities
Operation of investment companies
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Operation of holiday cottages
Private persons with the name Stefan Simon
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Stefan Simon
Publication number: HR02-1006078139, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Janus Energy AG, in Kerns, CHE-356.433.499, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2023, Publ. 1005804235).
Statutenänderung:
24.06.2024.
Firma neu:
Saranggola Energy AG.
Sitz neu:
Sarnen.
Domizil neu:
Kägiswilerstrasse 15, 6060 Sarnen. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Simon, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kerns, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gabriel, Othmar Nikolaus, von Ennetbürgen, in Sarnen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sunico, Theo Cruz, philippinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Pasig City (PH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005998002, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Sustainable Development Holding AG, in Kerns, CHE-114.591.312, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2023, Publ. 1005751597).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simon, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kerns, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Spindler, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Oschatz (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005902297, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung Montessori-Schule, in Luzern, CHE-107.375.625, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2022, Publ. 1005532916).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kron, Andreas, von Basel, in Beckenried, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hansi, Karin, von Lungern, in Luzern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schärer, Franziska, von Vordemwald, in Horw, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Düring, Aline, von Horw, in Luzern, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Dubai (AE), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Basmadjian, Gregory, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Simon, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Kerns, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.