Rudolf Alfred Scherer
domiciled in Meggen, from Meggen Active mandates: ALHO Systembau AG, FAGSI AG and more Connected persons: Sylvia Matschke-Holschbach, Albert Holschbach, Christopher Ziegler and more You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Alfred Scherer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Alfred Scherer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Alfred Scherer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Alfred Scherer"
|
Places where people with the name Rudolf Alfred Scherer live
Sectors in which people with the name Rudolf Alfred Scherer work
Production of metal goods
Trading with various goods
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Production of metal goods
Trading with various goods
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Rudolf Alfred Scherer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rudolf Alfred Scherer
Publication number: HR02-1005518478, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
ALHO Systembau AG, in Wikon, CHE-355.527.181, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 10.03.2021, Publ. 1005119996).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Käser, Christian, von Schinznach, in Hunzenschwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherer, Rudolf, von Meggen, in Meggen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005518483, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
FAGSI AG, in Wikon, CHE-453.721.778, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 01.06.2021, Publ. 1005199972).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Käser, Christian, von Schinznach, in Hunzenschwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherer, Rudolf, von Meggen, in Meggen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2541033, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
La Perla Immo AG, in Luzern, CHE-116.291.134, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 02.05.2012, Publ. 6662460).
Statutenänderung:
09.12.2015.
Sitz neu:
Meggen.
Domizil neu:
Kreuzbuchstrasse 6, 6045 Meggen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lötscher, Dominique, von Kriens, in Horw, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scherer, Rudolf, von Meggen, in Meggen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Scherer, Sylvia Nelly, von Meggen, in Zug, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift].