Alfred Schär
domiciled in Schangnau, from Dürrenroth Active mandates: Autoverkehr Schangnau-Kemmeriboden AG Connected persons: Matthias Gfeller, Walter Bieri You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
|
|
Alfred Schär
domiciled in Dotzigen, from Dotzigen Active mandates: Stiftung Kinder- und Jugendheim Hübeli Connected persons: Peter Siegenthaler, Roger Eichenberger, Marc Renato Schwab and more You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
|
|
Alfred Schär
domiciled in Holderbank SO, from Eriswil Active mandates: Alfred Schär Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Alfred Schär", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Alfred Schär"
|
Places where people with the name Alfred Schär live
Sectors in which people with the name Alfred Schär work
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Operation of restaurants
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Operation of restaurants
Private persons with the name Alfred Schär
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Alfred Schär
Publication number: HR02-1005846382, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gewerkschaftliche Wohn- und Baugenossenschaft GEWOBAG, in Zürich, CHE-101.368.294, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2023, Publ. 1005703761).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schär, Alfred, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bochsler, Stephan, von Zürich, in Aeugst am Albis, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Schorno, Mirco, von Rothenthurm, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004916040, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Autoverkehr Schangnau-Kemmeriboden AG, in Schangnau, CHE-111.717.048, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 03.06.2019, Publ. 1004642609).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Invernizzi, Heinrich, von Mühlau, in Schangnau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gfeller, Matthias, von Röthenbach im Emmental, in Schangnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schär, Alfred, von Dürrenroth, in Schangnau, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bieri, Walter, von Schangnau, in Schangnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3598675, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2017, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 8'117 vom 24.05.2017 Stiftung Kinder- und Jugendheim Hübeli, in Diessbach bei Büren, CHE-107.180.352, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2017, Publ. 3549433).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schär, Alfred, von Dotzigen, in Dotzigen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [nicht: Schär, Walter].