Anton Saxer
domiciled in Muttenz, from Hägglingen Active mandates: Anton Saxer AG Abfall-Translogistik, Anton Saxer GmbH Gewerbe-Entsorgung Connected persons: Steve Saxer, Jan Saxer, Jan Saxer and more You can stay up to date through "Anton Saxer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anton Saxer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anton Saxer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anton Saxer"
|
|
Anton Saxer
domiciled in Hägglingen, from Ruswil Active mandates: Anton Saxer Connected persons: Brigitte Saxer You can stay up to date through "Anton Saxer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anton Saxer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Anton Saxer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Anton Saxer"
|
Places where people with the name Anton Saxer live
Sectors in which people with the name Anton Saxer work
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Gardening and landscaping
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Gardening and landscaping
Private persons with the name Anton Saxer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Anton Saxer
Publication number: HR02-1005580621, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Antis Immobilien AG, in Wohlenschwil, CHE-107.135.707, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 26.01.2021, Publ. 1005083767).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Saxer, Anton, von Hägglingen, in Wohlenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Monika, von Hägglingen, in Wohlenschwil, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelprokura];
Saxer, Armando, von Hägglingen, in Fahrwangen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Saxer, Michael, von Hägglingen, in Wohlenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005548241, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
LUSHBERRY BY NINA SAXER GmbH, in Bern, CHE-478.561.479, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2019, Publ. 1004692846).
Firma neu:
LUSHBERRY BY NINA SAXER GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 16.08.2022 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Saxer, Anton, von Hägglingen, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Marco Antonio, von Hägglingen, in Doha (QA), Gesellschafter, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Saxer, Jean-Pierre, von Hägglingen, in Bern, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005059558, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Anton Saxer AG Abfall-Translogistik, in Pratteln, CHE-114.608.378, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2017, Publ. 3261701).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saxer, Anton, von Hägglingen, in Muttenz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Saxer, Jan, von Hägglingen, in Muttenz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Saxer, Steve, von Hägglingen, in Arisdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift].