Daniel Savioz
domiciled in Saxon, from Saxon Active mandates: Daniel Savioz Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Daniel Savioz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniel Savioz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Daniel Savioz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniel Savioz"
|
Places where people with the name Daniel Savioz live
Sectors in which people with the name Daniel Savioz work
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Private persons with the name Daniel Savioz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Daniel Savioz
Publication number: HR02-1006039608, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Sogestion SA, à Lens, CHE-102.711.383, société anonyme (No. FOSC 87 du 06.05.2021, Publ. 1005172312).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Sogestion SA en liquidation.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Crans-Montana, Rue du Pas de l'Ours 5, 3963 Crans VS. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 08.05.2024.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bagnoud, Charles André, de Crans-Montana, à Chippis, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Savioz, Daniel, de Anniviers, à Crans-Montana, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005926661, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
INVESTSOFT SA en liquidation, à Lens, CHE-108.731.757, société anonyme (No. FOSC 113 du 15.06.2021, Publ. 1005218065).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Emery, Daniel, de Lens, à Sion, administrateur unique, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Savioz, Daniel, de Anniviers, à Crans-Montana, administrateur unique, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005924075, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Kokatu SA, à Lens, CHE-102.104.272, société anonyme (No. FOSC 117 du 20.06.2023, Publ. 1005773373).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Gillioz, Laurent, de Saint-Léonard, à Crans-Montana, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Savioz, Daniel, de Anniviers, à Crans-Montana, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.