Margarete Helene Sanft
domiciled in Zuben, from Germany Active mandates: BOMA Energie Handel AG in Liquidation, Q One Holding AG Connected persons: Gerhard Klein You can stay up to date through "Margarete Helene Sanft", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Margarete Helene Sanft"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Margarete Helene Sanft", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Margarete Helene Sanft"
|
Places where people with the name Margarete Helene Sanft live
Sectors in which people with the name Margarete Helene Sanft work
Electrical power production and utilities
Legal counsel
Electrical power production and utilities
Legal counsel
Private persons with the name Margarete Helene Sanft
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Margarete Helene Sanft
Publication number: HR02-1005851231, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
BOMA Energie Handel AG, in Bottighofen, CHE-290.138.607, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 210 vom 28.10.2020, Publ. 1005010070).
Firma neu:
BOMA Energie Handel AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 20.09.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sanft, Margarete Helene, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zuben (Langrickenbach), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Langrickenbach, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005784377, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Q One Holding AG, in Sarnen, CHE-372.880.655, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2020, Publ. 1005030104).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klein, Gerhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wilen (Sarnen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sanft, Margarete Helene, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Zuben (Langrickenbach), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005030104, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Q One Holding AG, in Sarnen, CHE-372.880.655, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 19.02.2020, Publ. 1004833771).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sanft, Margarete Helene, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Langrickenbach, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klein, Gerhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Sarnen, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.