Christine Rupp
domiciled in Fiesch, from Pfäfers Active mandates: Berghotel Derby, Rupp & Co. Connected persons: Egbert Riko Caverlé, Michèle Rupp-Tuurenhout You can stay up to date through "Christine Rupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Rupp"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christine Rupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Rupp"
|
|
Christine Rupp
domiciled in Gränichen, from Seon Active mandates: Pemag Treuhand AG, Automobile Rupp AG Connected persons: Reto Baumann, Othmar Grüter, Florian Hüsler and more You can stay up to date through "Christine Rupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Rupp"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christine Rupp", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christine Rupp"
|
Places where people with the name Christine Rupp live
Sectors in which people with the name Christine Rupp work
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Fiduciary services
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Fiduciary services
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Private persons with the name Christine Rupp
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christine Rupp
Publication number: 2562521, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Berghotel Derby, Rupp & Co., in Fiesch, CHE-312.394.606, Umfahrungsstrasse 2, 3984 Fiesch, Kommanditgesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Beginn:
01.12.2015.
Zweck:
Hotel-Restaurant;
Betrieb einer Broccanterie und Kunstgalerie.
Eingetragene Personen:
Rupp-Tuurenhout, Michèle, von Pfäfers, in Fiesch, unbeschränkt haftende Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rupp, Christine, von Pfäfers, in Fiesch, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Caverlé, Egbert Riko, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Fiesch, Kommanditär, mit Einzelprokura, mit einer Kommanditsumme von CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: 1865343, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Berghotel Derby, van den Dool & Caverlé, in Fiesch, CHE-114.579.357, Kollektivgesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 01.10.2012, Publ. 6871030).
Firma neu:
Berghotel Derby, Caverlé & Co..
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
van den Dool, Margaretha Sophia Adriana, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Fiesch, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rupp-Tuurenhout, Michèle, von Pfäfers, in Pfäfers, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rupp, Christine, von Pfäfers, in Pfäfers, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1424099, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Altersbetreuung Hindelbank, in Hindelbank, CHE-112.363.208, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 16.04.2012, Publ. 6639228).
Name neu:
Stiftung Altersbetreuung Hindelbank in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Justiz-, Gemeinde- und Kirchendirektion des Kantons Bern (JGK) vom 13.02.2014 aufgehoben.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneiter, Otto, von Feuerthalen, in Hindelbank, Mitglied und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bachmann, Dr. Martin, von Bäriswil, in Hindelbank, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rupp, Christine, von Haut-Vully, in Hindelbank, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dürig, Kurt, von Krauchthal, in Hindelbank, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sommer, Bruno, von Sumiswald, in Hindelbank, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
BRT Treuhand AG (CHE-108.609.033), in Burgdorf, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BRT Treuhand AG (CH-053.3.005.161-6)].