Walter Georg Rumpf
domiciled in Bern, from Basel Active mandates: bureau K. SA, Immobilien AG Schwanengasse 8 and more Connected persons: Francesco Marco Rappa, Philipp Stucki, André Kotoun and more You can stay up to date through "Walter Georg Rumpf", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Georg Rumpf"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Walter Georg Rumpf", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Walter Georg Rumpf"
|
Places where people with the name Walter Georg Rumpf live
Sectors in which people with the name Walter Georg Rumpf work
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Walter Georg Rumpf
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Walter Georg Rumpf
Publication number: HR02-1005931399, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
bureau K. SA, in Muri bei Bern, CHE-201.862.790, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2022, Publ. 1005490091).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bütikofer, Christian, von Ersigen, in Gossau SG, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rumpf, Walter, von Basel, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005797712, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arbeitsmarktkontrolle Bern (AMKBE), in Bern, CHE-114.511.394, Verein (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 05.05.2023, Publ. 1005739145).
Statutenänderung:
28.04.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Castro, Antonio, von Ipsach, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rumpf, Walter, von Basel, in Bern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischer, Yvonne, von Ringgenberg (BE), in Frauenkappelen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zahler, Alain, von Haute-Sorne, in Safnern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
GEWERBETREUHAND AG BERN (CHE-107.985.580), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Gewerbetreuhand AG Treuhandstelle des Gewerbeverbandes der Stadt Bern (CHE-107.985.580)].
Publication number: HR02-1005739145, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arbeitsmarktkontrolle Bern (AMKBE), in Bern, CHE-114.511.394, Verein (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2021, Publ. 1005300900).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rumpf, Walter, von Basel, in Bern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Matosevic, Daniel, von Niedergösgen, in Itingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Boschung, Ursula, von Bösingen, in Bösingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.