Stefan Ruge
domiciled in Bremen, from Germany Active mandates: Bruker Switzerland AG Connected persons: Sascha Oliver Stocker, Patrick Büchi, Jens Höhndorf and more You can stay up to date through "Stefan Ruge", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Ruge"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Ruge", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Ruge"
|
Places where people with the name Stefan Ruge live
Sectors in which people with the name Stefan Ruge work
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Private persons with the name Stefan Ruge
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Stefan Ruge
Publication number: HR02-1004715285, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bruker Switzerland AG, in Fällanden, CHE-101.138.357, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.2019, Publ. 1004661957).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fäh, Urban August, von Kaltbrunn, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruge, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bremen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3053253, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bruker Daltonics GmbH, in Fällanden, CHE-105.580.048, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2015, Publ. 2414923).
Statutenänderung:
08.09.2016.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roth, Jeannine Isabelle, von Seedorf BE, in Winterthur, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bischofberger, Reto, von Teufen AR, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruge, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bremen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3053255, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bruker Optics GmbH, in Fällanden, CHE-105.532.256, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 25.09.2014, Publ. 1732469).
Statutenänderung:
08.09.2016.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fäh, Urban, von Kaltbrunn, in Volketswil, Geschäftsführer und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bischofberger, Reto, von Teufen AR, in Zürich, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knell, Michael, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Weymouth (US), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruge, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bremen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wischnewski, Dirk, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Langenfeld (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.