Hugues-Vincent Roy
domiciled in Clarens, from Bretonnières Active mandates: AISA Automation Industrielle S.A., Fondation de prévoyance AISA and more Connected persons: Engelbert Sander, Joachim Sander, Alain Perreaud and more You can stay up to date through "Hugues-Vincent Roy", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hugues-Vincent Roy"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Hugues-Vincent Roy", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hugues-Vincent Roy"
|
Places where people with the name Hugues-Vincent Roy live
Sectors in which people with the name Hugues-Vincent Roy work
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Operation of an pension fund
Other Business-to-Business services
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Operation of an pension fund
Other Business-to-Business services
Private persons with the name Hugues-Vincent Roy
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Hugues-Vincent Roy
Publication number: 2311971, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
AISA Automation Industrielle S.A., à Vouvry, CHE-101.585.503, société anonyme (No. FOSC 17 du 25.01.2013, Publ. 7034332).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Grossenbacher, Pierre, de Trachselwald, à Clarens (Montreux), administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Sander, Joachim, de Vouvry, à Blonay, président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur-délégué avec signature collective à deux];
Sander, Engelbert, de Vouvry, à Vouvry, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président avec signature individuelle];
Roy, Hugues-Vincent, de Bretonnières, à Clarens (Montreux), directeur général, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: directeur avec signature collective à deux];
Perreaud, Alain, de Romainmôtier-Envy, à Ollon, directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: sous-directeur avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 7212380, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
MAG-PLASTIC MACHINERY S.A., à Vouvry, CH-621.3.006.611-6, société anonyme (No. FOSC 74 du 17.04.2012, Publ. 6640102).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
MAG-PLASTIC MACHINERY S.A. en liquidation. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 17.05.2013.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Sander, Joachim, de Vouvry, à Blonay, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Roy, Hugues-Vincent, de Bretonnières, à Clarens (Montreux), administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Hitzig, Andreas, de Zürich, à Corseaux, liquidateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur-délégué avec signature collective à deux];
Perreaud, Alain, de Romainmôtier-Envy et L'Abbaye, à Ollon VD, liquidateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 7034332, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
AISA Automation Industrielle S.A., à Vouvry, CH-621.3.000.022-3, société anonyme (No. FOSC 201 du 15.10.2010, p. 17, Publ. 5855552).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Roy, Hugues-Vincent, de Bretonnières, à Clarens (Montreux), directeur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à St-Légier (Saint-Légier-La Chiésaz)].