Julien Rouvinez
domiciled in Venthône, from Anniviers Active mandates: Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA, Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA, succursale de Sion and more Connected persons: Vincent Sébastien Jäggi, Nicolas Pierre Alexandre Gillard, Frédéric Rochat and more You can stay up to date through "Julien Rouvinez", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Julien Rouvinez"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Julien Rouvinez", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Julien Rouvinez"
|
Places where people with the name Julien Rouvinez live
Sectors in which people with the name Julien Rouvinez work
Notary and advocate office
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of investment companies
Passenger and cargo transportation, air travel
Trading in food products
Viticulture
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Notary and advocate office
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of investment companies
Passenger and cargo transportation, air travel
Trading in food products
Viticulture
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Julien Rouvinez
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Julien Rouvinez
Publication number: HR02-1005298555, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Shisha Assets SA, à Sion, CHE-114.281.219, société anonyme (No. FOSC 105 du 03.06.2021, Publ. 1005205998).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Shisha Assets SA en liquidation.
Autres adresses:
c/o Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA, Rue du Scex 4, 1950 Sion (adresse de liquidation). La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 30.08.2021.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Me Rouvinez, Julien, de Anniviers, à Noble-Contrée, administrateur unique, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005298548, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
db Consultants SA, à Sion, CHE-319.179.109, société anonyme (No. FOSC 105 du 03.06.2021, Publ. 1005205990).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
db Consultants SA en liquidation.
Autres adresses:
c/o Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA, Rue du Scex 4, 1950 Sion (adresse de liquidation). La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 30.08.2021.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Me Rouvinez, Julien, de Anniviers, à Noble-Contrée, administrateur unique, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1004870540, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA, succursale de Sion, à Sion, CHE-313.236.364, Rue du Scex 4, 1951 Sion, succursale suisse (Nouvelle inscription).
Numéro d'identification du siège principal:
CHE-252.062.966.
Raison de commerce du siège principal:
Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion SA (Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion AG) (Kellerhals Carrard Lausanne/Sion Ltd).
Nature juridique du siège principal:
Société anonyme.
Siège principal:
Lausanne.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Rouvinez, Julien, de Anniviers, à Venthône, directeur, avec signature individuelle limitée à la succursale.