Marianne Rohrbach
domiciled in Schwarzenburg, from Schwarzenburg Active mandates: Volz Brillen & Kontaktlinsen AG Connected persons: Christoph Von Dach You can stay up to date through "Marianne Rohrbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marianne Rohrbach"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marianne Rohrbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marianne Rohrbach"
|
|
Marianne Rohrbach
domiciled in Milken, from Wahlern Active mandates: Rest. Zwahlen, Inhaberin Rohrbach Marianne Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Marianne Rohrbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marianne Rohrbach"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marianne Rohrbach", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marianne Rohrbach"
|
Places where people with the name Marianne Rohrbach live
Sectors in which people with the name Marianne Rohrbach work
Trading with various goods
Management of restaurants
Trading with various goods
Management of restaurants
Private persons with the name Marianne Rohrbach
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marianne Rohrbach
Publication number: HR02-1006048342, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB vom 28.05.2024, Meldungs Nr. 1'006'041'377, publizierten Tagesregistereintrag Nr. 8'680 vom 23.05.2024 NPSuisse Schweizerische Niemann-Pick-Vereinigung, in Unterägeri, CHE-356.792.082, Verein (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 28.05.2024, Publ. 1006041377).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kälin, Sven, von Einsiedeln, in Schübelbach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rohrbach, Dr. Marianne, von Rüeggisberg, in Mettmenstetten, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 3481585, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Volz Brillen & Kontaktlinsen AG, in Schwarzenburg, CHE-100.340.293, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 19.02.2010, Publ. 5504830).
Domizil neu:
Bernstrasse 4, 3150 Schwarzenburg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Hermann, von Appenzell, in Schwarzenburg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohrbach, Marianne, von Schwarzenburg, in Schwarzenburg, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Wahlern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
von Dach, Christoph, von Frutigen, in Schwarzenburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6728216, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
NPSuisse Schweizerische Niemann-Pick-Vereinigung, in Unterägeri, CH-170.6.000.247-1, Verein (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 11.04.2012, Publ. 6632094).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohrbach, Dr. Marianne, von Rüeggisberg, in Mettmenstetten, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Herrliberg].