Claude Robyr
domiciled in Crans-Montana, from Crans-Montana Active mandates: Banque Raiffeisen des Communes du Haut-Plateau société coopérative Connected persons: Caroline Beney-Rossier, Lionel Briguet, Rui Miguel Carvalho Ferreira and more You can stay up to date through "Claude Robyr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Robyr"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claude Robyr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claude Robyr"
|
Places where people with the name Claude Robyr live
Sectors in which people with the name Claude Robyr work
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Private persons with the name Claude Robyr
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claude Robyr
Publication number: HR02-1005136490, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
F. Robyr SA, à Crans-Montana, CHE-105.861.398, société anonyme (No. FOSC 64 du 01.04.2020, Publ. 1004864138).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
F. Robyr SA en liquidation.
Autres adresses:
c/o Claude Robyr, Route des Sommets de Crans 28, 3963 Crans-Montana (adresse de liquidation). La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 10.03.2021.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Robyr, Claude, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, administrateur unique, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 4241111, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Les Capucines SA, à Crans-Montana, CHE-109.451.450, société anonyme (No. FOSC 5 du 09.01.2017, Publ. 3270103).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Robyr, Claude, de Crans-Montana, à Lens, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3270427, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société Anonyme G. Barras Montana-Vermala-Crans, à Montana, CHE-100.845.506, société anonyme (No. FOSC 177 du 13.09.2011, Publ. 6333124).
Nouveau siège:
Crans-Montana. [Siège modifié d'office par suite d'entrée en vigueur de la fusion des communes de Chermignon, Mollens VS, Montana et Randogne le 01.01.2017].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Barras, Daniel, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Chermignon, à Montana];
Barras, François, de Crans-Montana, à La Tour-de-Peilz, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Chermignon];
Barras, Jérôme, de Crans-Montana, à Genève, président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Chermignon];
Robyr, Claude, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Montana, à Montana].