Bruno Ritz
domiciled in Muhen, from Zürich Active mandates: triple-di GmbH in Liquidation Connected persons: Jacqueline Morina, Denise Frey-Frank You can stay up to date through "Bruno Ritz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Ritz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bruno Ritz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Ritz"
|
|
Bruno Ritz
domiciled in Muhen, from Zürich Active mandates: Flubag Flugbetriebs-AG Beromünster Connected persons: Dominik Simmen, Marc Andreas Siegenthaler, Michael Spanier and more You can stay up to date through "Bruno Ritz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Ritz"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Bruno Ritz", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Bruno Ritz"
|
Places where people with the name Bruno Ritz live
Sectors in which people with the name Bruno Ritz work
Trading in food products
Other transportation services
Trading in food products
Other transportation services
Private persons with the name Bruno Ritz
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Bruno Ritz
Publication number: HR02-1005355361, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
triple-di GmbH in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-112.880.395, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2014, S.0, Publ. 1561881).
Domizil neu:
Die Gesellschaft hat ihr Domizil eingebüsst.
Weitere Adressen:
Liquidationsadresse: c/o Bruno Ritz, Hauptstrasse 29, 5037 Muhen. [gestrichen: Liquidationsadresse: c/o Bruno Ritz, Mühlestrasse 2, 8344 Bäretswil.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ritz, Bruno, von Zürich, in Muhen, Gesellschafter, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: HR02-1005298998, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Flubag Flugbetriebs-AG Beromünster, in Beromünster, CHE-101.951.097, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 11.01.2021, Publ. 1005070019).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sandmeier, Ruedi, von Seengen, in Seengen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ritz, Bruno, von Zürich, in Muhen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Simmen, Dominik, von Safenwil, in Gontenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1004922478, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2020, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 8'747 vom 15.06.2020 Gesytech GmbH, in Burgdorf, CHE-114.839.305, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2020, Publ. 1004913496).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ritz, Bruno René, von Goms, in Grafenried (Fraubrunnen), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [nicht: von Fraubrunnen].