Christoph Rieder
domiciled in Lommiswil, from St. Stephan Active mandates: RRN Technology GmbH Connected persons: Oliver Rolli You can stay up to date through "Christoph Rieder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Rieder"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Rieder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Rieder"
|
|
Christoph Rieder
domiciled in Wiler (Lötschen), from Wiler (Lötschen) Active mandates: CR Holz & Stein Bau-GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Christoph Rieder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Rieder"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Rieder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Rieder"
|
Places where people with the name Christoph Rieder live
Sectors in which people with the name Christoph Rieder work
Telephone and telecommunications
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Telephone and telecommunications
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Private persons with the name Christoph Rieder
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christoph Rieder
Publication number: 4090311, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Vinarte SA in Liquidation, in Elsau, CHE-100.423.370, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 24.11.2017, Publ. 3890223).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rieder, Christoph, von Grindelwald, in Elsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rieder, Fabian, von Grindelwald, in Elsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4087507, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Aktiva Treuhand & Verwaltungs-AG, in Elsau, CHE-101.424.722, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2010, Publ. 5893932).
Firma neu:
Aktiva Treuhand & Verwaltungs-AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 14.02.2018 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rieder, Andreas, von Grindelwald, in Zell (ZH), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rieder, Christoph, von Grindelwald, in Elsau, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gross, Urs, von Elsau, in Elsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3890223, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Vinarte SA, in Elsau, CHE-100.423.370, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 03.09.2009, Publ. 5229538).
Firma neu:
Vinarte SA in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 15.11.2017 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rieder, Christoph, von Grindelwald, in Elsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].