Marc Georges Reinau
domiciled in Rheinfelden, from Basel Active mandates: Sowag AG für sozialen Wohnungsbau Connected persons: Rolf Luder, Carlo Andreatta, Urs Roos and more You can stay up to date through "Marc Georges Reinau", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc Georges Reinau"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marc Georges Reinau", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marc Georges Reinau"
|
Places where people with the name Marc Georges Reinau live
Sectors in which people with the name Marc Georges Reinau work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Marc Georges Reinau
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marc Georges Reinau
Publication number: HR02-1005517835, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2022, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 8'900 vom 24.06.2022 Normdach Swiss AG, in Rheinfelden, CHE-195.421.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2022, Publ. 1005507758).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reinau, Marc Georges, von Basel, in Rheinfelden, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2751927, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Normdach Swiss AG, in Rheinfelden, CHE-195.421.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 43 vom 02.03.2016, Publ. 2699441).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Thomas, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Reinau, Marc Georges, von Basel, in Rheinfelden, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2326565, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Sowag AG für sozialen Wohnungsbau, in Basel, CHE-101.258.228, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 06.06.2014, Publ. 1541825).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fumasoli, Arturo, von Cadro, in Münchenstein, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reinau, Marc, von Basel, in Rheinfelden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.