Christoph Plattner
domiciled in Münchenstein, from Bretzwil Active mandates: Acturum AG, MMK Immo-Rent GmbH and more Connected persons: Gerhard Adolf Gräfer, Maria Magdalena Kästl, Thomas Schweizer and more You can stay up to date through "Christoph Plattner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Plattner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christoph Plattner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christoph Plattner"
|
Places where people with the name Christoph Plattner live
Sectors in which people with the name Christoph Plattner work
Other transportation services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Passenger and cargo transportation by ship (non-maritime)
Production and processing of wooden goods
Telephone and telecommunications
Fiduciary services
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Other transportation services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Passenger and cargo transportation by ship (non-maritime)
Production and processing of wooden goods
Telephone and telecommunications
Fiduciary services
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Private persons with the name Christoph Plattner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christoph Plattner
Publication number: HR02-1005966960, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Artemis Executive Search GmbH, in Basel, CHE-114.375.754, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 02.04.2020, Publ. 1004864698).
Domizil neu:
c/o Immopiazza AG, Burgfelderstrasse 20, 4055 Basel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niedergang, Jean-Luc, französischer Staaatsangehöriger, in Guebwiller (FR), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Plattner, Christoph, von Bretzwil, in Münchenstein, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Immopiazza AG (CHE-207.400.376), in Basel, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Bertazzo, Aldo, von Basel, in Bottmingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005965854, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sprint Transport GmbH, in Münchenstein, CHE-240.248.665, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 25.05.2022, Publ. 1005481861).
Statutenänderung:
07.02.2024.
Sitz neu:
Frenkendorf.
Domizil neu:
Eggstrasse 62, 4402 Frenkendorf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Plattner, Christoph, von Bretzwil, in Münchenstein, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Avdija, Xheladin, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Frenkendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Gräfer, Gerhard Adolf, genannt Gerhard, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lörrach (DE), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005847647, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
INTS IT IS NOT THE SAME GmbH, in Steinhausen, CHE-113.290.316, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2023, Publ. 1005805233).
Statutenänderung:
12.09.2023.
Sitz neu:
Zug.
Domizil neu:
c/o Amicorp Switzerland AG, Baarerstrasse 75, 6300 Zug. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Plattner, Christoph, von Bretzwil, in Münchenstein, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bonet Masdeu, Montserrat, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Barcelona (ES), Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Van Hove, Arnaud, von Lauterbrunnen, in Fribourg, Prokurist, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auladell Mestre, Jaume, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Barcelona (ES), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Incognito, Giorgio Alessandro Luciano, von Cartigny, in Chêne-Bourg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Pesciatini, Diego, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Egg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Ojinaga Cebrian, Alberto, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Barcelona (ES), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift].