Dario Picardi
domiciled in Kilchberg, from Italy Active mandates: Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hogg Robinson Switzerland Ltd. in Liquidation, Global Business Travel Switzerland AG Connected persons: Ugur Ihsan Aykol, Michael Kälin, Daniel Tischhauser and more You can stay up to date through "Dario Picardi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dario Picardi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dario Picardi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dario Picardi"
|
Places where people with the name Dario Picardi live
Sectors in which people with the name Dario Picardi work
Operation of an pension fund
Travel agency and tour operator services
Operation of an pension fund
Travel agency and tour operator services
Private persons with the name Dario Picardi
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dario Picardi
Publication number: HR02-1005784020, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hogg Robinson Switzerland Ltd. in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-110.499.021, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2023, Publ. 1005773646).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Moreillon, Patrick Alain, von Bex, in Mont-sur-Rolle, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Picardi, Dario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kilchberg (ZH), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Aykol, Ugur Ihsan, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005773646, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hogg Robinson Switzerland Ltd., in Zürich, CHE-110.499.021, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 22.01.2021, Publ. 1005080465).
Name neu:
Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hogg Robinson Switzerland Ltd. in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 20.04.2023 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Moreillon, Patrick Alain, von Bex, in Mont-sur-Rolle, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Tischhauser, Daniel, von Grabs, in Merenschwand, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Picardi, Dario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kälin, Michael, von Einsiedeln, in Obersiggenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004787441, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Hogg Robinson Switzerland Ltd., in Zürich, CHE-106.848.093, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 05.11.2019, Publ. 1004752184).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Picardi, Dario, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kilchberg (ZH), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.