Georg Peter
domiciled in Niederhasli, from Wald (ZH) Active mandates: VASOPA AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Georg Peter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Peter"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Georg Peter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Peter"
|
|
Georg Peter
domiciled in Oberengstringen, from Adliswil Active mandates: MF Fleetmanagement AG Connected persons: Roger Kunz, Massimiliano Vena, Claudia Casagrande and more You can stay up to date through "Georg Peter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Peter"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Georg Peter", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Peter"
|
Places where people with the name Georg Peter live
Sectors in which people with the name Georg Peter work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other transportation services
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Other transportation services
Private persons with the name Georg Peter
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Georg Peter
Publication number: HR02-1005130467, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Peter Bausysteme AG, in Winterthur, CHE-108.633.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 12.02.2021, Publ. 1005098962).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter, Georg, von Wald ZH, in Niederhasli, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gamper, Roger, von Ottenbach, in Münsterlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lehrnbecher, Martin, von Zürich, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004696795, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Seilbahngenossenschaft Embd-Schalb, in Embd, CHE-101.918.208, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 02.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1692809).
Domizil neu:
c/o Lengen Alban, Egga 4, 3926 Embd.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peter, Georg Arnold, von Radelfingen, in Törbel, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lengen, Esther, von Embd, in Embd, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4350659, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pensionskasse PIG, Genossenschaft, in Winterthur, CHE-102.030.194, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 18.05.2015, Publ. 2157241).
Statutenänderung:
25.01.2018. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zemp, Monika, von Urnäsch, in Volketswil, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüegg, Myrtha, von Eschenbach SG, in Neftenbach, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weber, Joachim, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Oberbüren, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Peter, Georg, von Wald ZH, in Niederhasli, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann, Thomas, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Berli, Cédric, von Ottenbach, in Winterthur, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häuptli, Richard, von Biberstein, in Zell (ZH), Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.