Ivica Perkovic
domiciled in Baar, from Arth Active mandates: Profertis AG, PlanA Gebäudetechnik AG and more Connected persons: Thomas Christian Brun, Thomas Christian Brun, Dalibor Mijic and more You can stay up to date through "Ivica Perkovic", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ivica Perkovic"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Ivica Perkovic", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ivica Perkovic"
|
Places where people with the name Ivica Perkovic live
Sectors in which people with the name Ivica Perkovic work
Operation of other financial institutions
Other construction
Management of real estate portfolio properties
General structural engineering
Operation of other financial institutions
Other construction
Management of real estate portfolio properties
General structural engineering
Private persons with the name Ivica Perkovic
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Ivica Perkovic
Publication number: HR02-1005051911, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
No. 5 Smokers Lounge AG, in Baar, CHE-472.036.192, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 13.06.2018, Publ. 4286825).
Statutenänderung:
30.11.2020.
Firma neu:
WEISSROT & ROSÉ AG.
Sitz neu:
Zug.
Domizil neu:
Gubelstrasse 5, 6300 Zug.
Zweck neu:
Betrieb von Gastronomie-Objekten, Handel mit Gastronomie-Produkten, insbesondere mit Lebensmitteln, Zigarren und Spirituosen sowie Erbringung damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktien neu:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perkovic, Ivica, von Arth, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mijic, Dalibor, kroatischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arth, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004773467, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
PlanA Gebäudetechnik AG, in Baar, CHE-478.588.946, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 18.03.2019, Publ. 1004589631).
Statutenänderung:
11.11.2019.
Sitz neu:
Steinhausen.
Domizil neu:
Hammerstrasse 7, 6312 Steinhausen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perkovic, Ivica, von Arth, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004677486, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Elsener-Klima AG, in Adliswil, CHE-106.938.690, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2019, Publ. 1004582097).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perkovic, Ivica, von Arth, in Baar, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.