Lucas Gustav Ospelt
domiciled in Vaduz, from Liechtenstein Active mandates: PHILENA Anstalt, Neostrada Anstalt and more Connected persons: Hans-Peter Negele, Hans-Peter Negele, Hans-Peter Negele and more You can stay up to date through "Lucas Gustav Ospelt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lucas Gustav Ospelt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lucas Gustav Ospelt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lucas Gustav Ospelt"
|
Places where people with the name Lucas Gustav Ospelt live
Sectors in which people with the name Lucas Gustav Ospelt work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
BranchCode_n/a
Fund management
Operation of other financial institutions
Other construction
Management of real estate portfolio properties
BranchCode_n/a
Fund management
Operation of other financial institutions
Other construction
Private persons with the name Lucas Gustav Ospelt
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lucas Gustav Ospelt
Publication number: HR02-1005223516, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lafos Holding AG, in Buchs (SG), CHE-112.664.816, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 12.03.2019, Publ. 1004585652).
Firma neu:
Lafos Holding AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 14.06.2021 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lippuner, Roger, von Grabs, in Buchs SG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Gams, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Negele, Hans Peter, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Triesenberg (LI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ospelt, Lucas Gustav, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vaduz (LI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien]. [Anpassung der Funktionen aufgrund geänderter Eintragungspraxis].
Publication number: HR02-1004496661, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Inretis Holding AG, in Chur, CHE-112.673.471, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 04.03.2016, Publ. 2704853).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ospelt, Lucas Gustav, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vaduz (LI), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3490139, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Lafos Holding AG, in Chur, CHE-112.664.816, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 05.11.2013, Publ. 1163645).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ospelt, Lucas Gustav, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vaduz (LI), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision (CHE-107.060.038), in Chur, Revisionsstelle [bisher: RRT AG Treuhand und Revision (CH-350.3.003.457-4)].