Daniel Oschwald
domiciled in Aarburg, from Aarburg and Thayngen Connected persons: Sakir Uçar, Ute Oschwald-Schöllkopf You can stay up to date through "Daniel Oschwald", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniel Oschwald"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Daniel Oschwald", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Daniel Oschwald"
|
Places where people with the name Daniel Oschwald live
Sectors in which people with the name Daniel Oschwald work
Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Manufacturing and processing of building material and goods thereof
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Daniel Oschwald
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Daniel Oschwald
Publication number: HR02-1004752419, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Vertical Ventures GmbH, bisher in Zürich, CHE-181.499.075, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2018, Publ. 4301539).
Statutenänderung:
07.10.2019.
Sitz neu:
Schattdorf.
Domizil neu:
c/o Dario Poletti, Kirchgasse 13, 6467 Schattdorf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oschwald, Corinne, von Thayngen, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 90 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 167.00;
Staub, Nicola, von Menzingen, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 167.00;
echowerk gmbh (CHE-273.627.070), in Erlenbach (ZH), Gesellschafterin, mit 24 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 167.00;
Oschwald, Daniel, von Aarburg, in Aarburg, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Poletti, Dario, von Flüelen, in Schattdorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 167.00.
Publication number: 4301539, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Vertical Ventures GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-181.499.075, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2018, Publ. 4219977).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oschwald, Daniel, von Aarburg, in Aarburg, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schaub, Manuel Andreas Ramon, von Arisdorf, in Erlenbach (ZH), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4134413, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Samara AG, in Aarburg, CHE-227.765.438, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2017, Publ. 3817521).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oschwald, Daniel, von Aarburg, in Aarburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ucar, Sakir, von Illgau, in Küssnacht (SZ), Geschäftsführer, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.