Michel Bruno Orsinger
domiciled in Bursinel, from Diessenhofen and Bursinel Active mandates: Preci Health SA, Neo Medical SA and more Connected persons: Craig Richard Cook, Lucien André Christian Vouillamoz, Patrick Berdoz and more You can stay up to date through "Michel Bruno Orsinger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michel Bruno Orsinger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michel Bruno Orsinger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michel Bruno Orsinger"
|
Places where people with the name Michel Bruno Orsinger live
Sectors in which people with the name Michel Bruno Orsinger work
Research and development
Manufacturing of medical goods
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services regarding management consulting
Research and development
Manufacturing of medical goods
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Michel Bruno Orsinger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Michel Bruno Orsinger
Publication number: HR02-1004948590, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
AO Invest AG, in Chur, CHE-254.915.060, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 24.12.2018, Publ. 1004529553).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Orsinger, Michel, von Diessenhofen, in Bursinel, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Buchbinder, Daniel, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Scarsdale, New York (US), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Merz, Beat Roland, von Herisau, in Zumikon, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ries, Dr. Gerhard, von Nenzlingen, in Nenzlingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ziv, Amitai, israelischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kiryat-Ono (IL), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Cooper, Craig, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lindenmeyer, Christoph, von Oberburg, in Zug, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eigenmann Timmings, Irene, von Waldkirch, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Eigenmann-Timmings, Irene, in Echichens, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lehmann, Heinrich, von Langnau im Emmental, in Flurlingen, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004478982, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Geosatis SA, à Le Noirmont, CHE-314.332.639, société anonyme (No. FOSC 80 du 26.04.2018, Publ. 4196773).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Orsinger, Michel Bruno, de Diessenhofen, à Bursinel, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 3809687, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Geosatis SA, à Le Noirmont, CHE-314.332.639, société anonyme (No. FOSC 145 du 28.07.2017, Publ. 3672559).
Modification des statuts:
30.06.2017.
Nouveaux faits qualifiés:
Suppression de la clause statutaire relative à l'augmentation autorisée du capital (fondée sur la décision d'autorisation du 16.12.2015). [biffé: L'assemblée générale a introduit une clause statutaire relative à une augmentation autorisée du capital par décision du 16.12.2015. Pour les détails, voir les statuts]. L'assemblée générale a introduit une clause statutaire relative à une augmentation autorisée du capital par décision du 30.06.2017. Pour les détails, voir les statuts. L'assemblée générale a modifié la clause statutaire relative à une augmentation conditionnelle du capital (selon décision du 18.11.2014) par décision du 30.06.2017. Pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Donzé, Gérard Alfred, de Les Breuleux, à Le Roselet (Les Breuleux), membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Achache, José Jérôme, ressortissant français, à Chêne-Bougeries, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Dassault, Laurent René, ressortissant français, à Paris (FR), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Fernandes Demétrio, José Carlos, ressortissant portugais, à Les Emibois (Muriaux), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Lucien, Eric François André, ressortissant français, à Châtel-St-Denis (Châtel-Saint-Denis), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Orsinger, Michel Bruno, de Diessenhofen, à Bursinel, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.