Frank Nowak
domiciled in Planegg, from Germany Active mandates: T-Box SA Connected persons: Markus Bschorer, Willy Maag, Robert Michel You can stay up to date through "Frank Nowak", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Nowak"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Frank Nowak", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Frank Nowak"
|
Places where people with the name Frank Nowak live
Sectors in which people with the name Frank Nowak work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Frank Nowak
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Frank Nowak
Publication number: 2920255, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Quazhar Lightning Company AG, in Würenlos, CHE-228.309.540, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 31.03.2016, Publ. 2751879).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nowak, Frank, von Baar, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2751879, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Quazhar Lightning Company AG, in Würenlos, CHE-228.309.540, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 04.12.2015, Publ. 2520307).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nowak, Frank, von Baar, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Alraun, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Baden, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Flück, Daniel, von Brienz (BE), in Dietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2520307, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Quazhar Lightning Company AG, in Würenlos, CHE-228.309.540, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 09.09.2015, Publ. 2363347).
Statutenänderung:
23.11.2015.
Aktien neu:
1'000 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 100.00 [bisher: 20 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 5'000.00].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nowak, Frank, von Baar, in Baar, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger].