Sara Andrea Müller
domiciled in Bubikon, from Winterthur Active mandates: Jobsharing-Consulting MS AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Sara Andrea Müller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sara Andrea Müller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Sara Andrea Müller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sara Andrea Müller"
|
Places where people with the name Sara Andrea Müller live
Sectors in which people with the name Sara Andrea Müller work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Sara Andrea Müller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Sara Andrea Müller
Publication number: 3890107, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jobsharing-Consulting MS AG, in Küsnacht (ZH), CHE-115.484.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 03.02.2017, Publ. 3324873).
Statutenänderung:
20.11.2017.
Sitz neu:
Bubikon.
Domizil neu:
Ritterhausstrasse 8, 8608 Bubikon.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Sara Andrea, von Winterthur, in Bubikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Küsnacht (ZH)].
Publication number: 3324873, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Jobsharing-Consulting MS AG, in Küsnacht ZH, CHE-115.484.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 26.08.2016, Publ. 3022501).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Tobias Michael, von Unterengstringen, in Küsnacht ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Sara Andrea, von Winterthur, in Küsnacht ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 3053245, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BHF-BANK (Schweiz) AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.870.238, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 01.09.2016, Publ. 3031721).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lähn, Dr. Marcel Vincent, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bad Homburg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huster, Patrick, von Zürich, in Wädenswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Nägele, Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Horgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schweizer, Monika, von Rümlang, in Rümlang, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wartmann, Marc, von Bauma, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wartmann, Janne, dänische Staatsangehörige, in Oberwil-Lieli, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Müller, Sara, von Winterthur, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.