Rony Müller
domiciled in Winterthur, from Zumikon and Boltigen Active mandates: Q-Linked AG, Adiutec AG Connected persons: Christian Schönholzer, Loïc Mesqui, Rolf Abrach and more You can stay up to date through "Rony Müller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rony Müller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rony Müller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rony Müller"
|
Places where people with the name Rony Müller live
Sectors in which people with the name Rony Müller work
Services regarding management consulting
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding management consulting
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Rony Müller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rony Müller
Publication number: 3837719, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Q-Linked AG, in Zürich, CHE-256.459.570, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2017, Publ. 3663711).
Statutenänderung:
23.10.2017.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 50'000.00].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mesqui, Loïc, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Müller, Rony, von Zumikon und Boltigen, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ryser, Paul, von Heimiswil, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1761431, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Adiutec AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.611.091, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 08.09.2008, S. 21, Publ. 4642140).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Rony, von Zumikon und Boltigen, in Winterthur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zollikon];
Gähwiler, Michael, von Zürich, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4239128, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
WISO Treuhand & Inkasso AG, in Reinach BL, CH-270.3.013.553-6, Ausführung von sämtlichen Treuhand- und Inkassodienstleistungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 23.03.2007, S. 5, Publ. 3854214).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Rony, von Fläsch, in Reinach BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brodbeck, Lukas, von Therwil und Basel, in Reinach BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].