Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher
domiciled in Richterswil, from Vinelz and Horgen Active mandates: Hafengenossenschaft Richterswil, RISA Liegenschaften AG and more Connected persons: René Füllemann, Matthias Hirschle, Stefan Fäs and more You can stay up to date through "Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher"
|
Places where people with the name Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher live
Sectors in which people with the name Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher work
Other transportation services
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Other transportation services
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of a printing plant and/or bindery
Private persons with the name Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Evelyn Meuter-Zürcher
Publication number: 6767848, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
H. Zürcher Werbedruck AG, in Richterswil, CH-020.3.929.584-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 26.01.2010, S. 30, Publ. 5460112).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meuter-Zürcher, Evelyn, von Vinelz und Horgen, in Richterswil, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführerin mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5460112, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
H. Zürcher Werbedruck AG, in Richterswil, CH-020.3.929.584-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2008, S. 24, Publ. 4331170).
Statutenänderung:
16.12.2009. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung vom 18.12.2009 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sofina AG, in Feusisberg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meuter-Zürcher, Evelyn, von Vinelz und Horgen, in Richterswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.