Michael Meier Thoma
domiciled in Wädenswil, from Zeihen Active mandates: Avenew GmbH in Liquidation, Bangkok Cuisine GmbH in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Yael Liliane Lilienfeld, Daniel Stauffacher, Lalisra Soifa and more You can stay up to date through "Michael Meier Thoma", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Meier Thoma"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Michael Meier Thoma", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Michael Meier Thoma"
|
Places where people with the name Michael Meier Thoma live
Sectors in which people with the name Michael Meier Thoma work
Research and development
Operation of restaurants
Services regarding management consulting
Fiduciary services
Research and development
Operation of restaurants
Services regarding management consulting
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Michael Meier Thoma
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Michael Meier Thoma
Publication number: HR02-1005793201, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MMC Finance AG, in Zürich, CHE-110.128.033, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2016, S.0, Publ. 2799667).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bollhalder, Christoph, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Rottenschwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier Thoma, Michael, von Zeihen, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005774775, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Avenew GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-458.446.295, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 02.04.2020, Publ. 1004864249).
Firma neu:
Avenew GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 14.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier Thoma, Michael, von Zeihen, in Horgen, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005732175, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Interim Management International AG, in Zürich, CHE-156.188.979, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 03.03.2022, Publ. 1005418689).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier Thoma, Michael, von Zeihen, in Horgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.