Muharem Mazreku
domiciled in Muri, from Kosovo Active mandates: IF-Transport AG, Schild Investment Holding AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Muharem Mazreku", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Muharem Mazreku"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Muharem Mazreku", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Muharem Mazreku"
|
Places where people with the name Muharem Mazreku live
Sectors in which people with the name Muharem Mazreku work
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Operation of other financial institutions
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Muharem Mazreku
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Muharem Mazreku
Publication number: HR02-1005958859, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
IF-Transport AG, in Wettingen, CHE-381.341.908, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 07.05.2020, Publ. 1004884722).
Statutenänderung:
31.01.2024.
Sitz neu:
Muri (AG).
Domizil neu:
Zurlaubenstrasse 2, 5630 Muri AG.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hyseni, Selman, von Obersiggenthal, in Neuenhof, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hyseni, Isuf, von Zeihen, in Neuenhof, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mazreku, Muharem, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Muri (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005753925, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schild Investment Holding AG, bisher in Luzern, CHE-233.117.710, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 02.02.2021, Publ. 1005089311).
Statutenänderung:
16.03.2023.
Sitz neu:
Oftringen.
Domizil neu:
Oberfeldstrasse 19, 4665 Oftringen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen schriftlich (durch Brief, Telefax, e-mail oder in anderer geeigneter Schriftform) an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen der einzelnen Aktionäre.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gashi, Muharrem, von Wynau, in Wynau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Mazreku, Muharem, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Boswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6966638, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
M & M Bau Mazreku, in Boswil, CHE-213.873.205, Muristrasse 20, 5623 Boswil, Einzelunternehmen (Neueintragung).
Zweck:
Durchführen von Bauarbeiten, insbesondere Renovations-, Schalungs- und Ausschalungsarbeiten.
Eingetragene Personen:
Mazreku, Muharem, kosovarischer Staatsangehöriger, in Boswil, Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift.