Seiji Masuda
domiciled in Wollerau, from Japan Active mandates: Adsum Swiss AG Connected persons: Jakob Höhn You can stay up to date through "Seiji Masuda", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Seiji Masuda"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Seiji Masuda", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Seiji Masuda"
|
Places where people with the name Seiji Masuda live
Sectors in which people with the name Seiji Masuda work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Seiji Masuda
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Seiji Masuda
Publication number: HR02-1005625714, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Adsum AG, in Wollerau, CHE-112.149.075, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2022, Publ. 1005616007).
Firma neu:
Adsum AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Adsum SA en liquidation) (Adsum Ltd in liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 29.11.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Masuda, Seiji, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wollerau, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005616007, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Adsum AG, in Wollerau, CHE-112.149.075, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 24 vom 04.02.2021, Publ. 1005091685).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fuchs, Josef, von Freienbach, in Wollerau, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Masuda, Seiji, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wollerau, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005390956, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Adsum Swiss AG, in Wollerau, CHE-253.821.829, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2021, Publ. 1005266922).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Masuda, Seiji, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wollerau, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Höhn, Dr. Jakob, von Horgen, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Direktor, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].