Mourad Malloul
domiciled in Herrliberg, from Schaffhausen Active mandates: RIVOLI GROUP AG Connected persons: André Kolditz You can stay up to date through "Mourad Malloul", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mourad Malloul"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Mourad Malloul", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Mourad Malloul"
|
Places where people with the name Mourad Malloul live
Sectors in which people with the name Mourad Malloul work
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Mourad Malloul
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Mourad Malloul
Publication number: HR02-1005423986, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Rivoli Management GmbH, bisher in Zürich, CHE-465.100.264, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 29.03.2021, Publ. 1005135471).
Statutenänderung:
08.02.2022.
Firma neu:
RVG Management GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Zug.
Domizil neu:
Steinhauserstrasse 74, 6300 Zug. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
RIVOLI GROUP AG (CHE-434.091.362), in St. Gallen, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Malloul, Mourad, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
MEDICLIMA-Consulting GmbH (CHE-481.588.705), in Baar, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Colshorn, Nicolai Helmut Carl-Hermann Claus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Baar, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004960352, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Connex Media AG, in Zürich, CHE-342.976.434, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2016, S.0, Publ. 2972405).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Malloul, Mourad, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004634829, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
THE RIVOLI GROUP AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-434.091.362, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2019, Publ. 1004545447).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Malloul, Mourad, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Herrliberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kolditz, Andre, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Reichenburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Schwerzmann, Markus, von Männedorf, in Stäfa, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Rohrbach, Allen, von Oberwil im Simmental, in Männedorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.