Heinz Mäder
domiciled in Wettingen, from Innerthal Active mandates: Siemens Schweiz AG Connected persons: Emma Johanna Maria Falck, Rahul Jaikaran Chillar, Petru Johannes Huurinainen and more You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
|
|
Heinz Mäder
domiciled in Uitikon Waldegg, from Zürich Active mandates: H. Mäder & Co Oberflächentechnik + Haustechnik Connected persons: Liselotte Mäder-Surber You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
|
|
Heinz Mäder
domiciled in Opfikon, from Boswil Active mandates: Katholische Kirchenstiftung St. Anna, Opfikon-Glattbrugg, Genossenschaft Dorf-Träff Opfikon Connected persons: Stefan Hubertus Isenecker, Thomas Lichtleitner, Verena Olga Jung-Manz and more You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Heinz Mäder", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Heinz Mäder"
|
Places where people with the name Heinz Mäder live
Sectors in which people with the name Heinz Mäder work
Manufacturing of electronic components
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Religious, political or secular associations
Other Business-to-Business services
Manufacturing of electronic components
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Religious, political or secular associations
Other Business-to-Business services
Private persons with the name Heinz Mäder
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Heinz Mäder
Publication number: HR02-1005742468, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Identech AG, in Winterthur, CHE-105.144.233, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2022, Publ. 1005514806).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mäder, Dr. Heinz, von Mühleberg und Fällanden, in Fällanden, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005237955, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Katholische Kirchenstiftung St. Anna, Opfikon-Glattbrugg, in Opfikon, CHE-132.004.586, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 21.10.2019, Publ. 1004741163).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jung-Manz, Verena Olga, von Zürich, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Mäder, Heinz, von Boswil, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR01-1004741163, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Katholische Kirchenstiftung St. Anna, Opfikon-Glattbrugg, in Opfikon, CHE-132.004.586, Wallisellerstrasse 20, 8152 Glattbrugg, Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
04.07.1955. 22.08.2019.
Zweck:
Die Stiftung bezweckt, der römisch-katholischen Kirche die Ausübung des Gottesdienstes und der Seelsorge im Gebiet der kirchenrechtlich umschriebenen Pfarrei St. Anna Opfikon-Glattbrugg und den römisch-katholischen Einwohnern dieses Gebietes die Erfüllung ihrer kirchlich-religiösen Pflichten zu ermöglichen bzw. zu erleichtern. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke. [Bemerkungen:] Die Stiftung ist eine kirchliche Stiftung, die nicht der staatlichen Aufsicht unterstellt ist und aufgrund des kirchlichen Charakters keine Revisionsstelle bezeichnen muss. Die kirchliche Aufsicht wird wahrgenommen durch den Bischof von Chur.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schwegler, Johann, von Hergiswil bei Willisau, in Opfikon, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gross, Georges C., von Mathon und Zürich, in Opfikon, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jung-Manz, Verena Olga, von Zürich, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bächli, Felix, von Würenlingen, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rüegg, Alex, von Zürich, Bauma und Wangen-Brüttisellen, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Mäder, Heinz, von Boswil, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Reding-Pommé, Susanne, von Glarus Nord, in Opfikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.