Benjamin Leo Leu
domiciled in Olten, from Witterswil Active mandates: EcoHandel AG, EcoKlima GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Benjamin Leo Leu", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Benjamin Leo Leu"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Benjamin Leo Leu", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Benjamin Leo Leu"
|
Places where people with the name Benjamin Leo Leu live
Sectors in which people with the name Benjamin Leo Leu work
Trading with machines
Other construction
Trading with machines
Other construction
Private persons with the name Benjamin Leo Leu
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Benjamin Leo Leu
Publication number: HR02-1005664894, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
EcoKlima GmbH, in Kölliken, CHE-436.596.147, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 165 vom 26.08.2022, Publ. 1005548672).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leu, Benjamin, von Witterswil, in Olten, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Sispony (AD)].
Publication number: HR02-1005547458, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
EcoHandel AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-168.191.296, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2022, Publ. 1005385399).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aerschmann, Pascal, von St. Antoni, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leu, Benjamin Leo, von Witterswil, in Olten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005385399, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
EcoHandel AG, bisher in Nottwil, CHE-168.191.296, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004904737).
Statutenänderung:
04.01.2022.
Sitz neu:
Steinhausen.
Domizil neu:
Eichholzweg 26B, 6312 Steinhausen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leu, Benjamin Leo, von Witterswil, in Olten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Llançà (ES)];
Aerschmann, Pascal, von St. Antoni, in Ingenbohl, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Nottwil].