Stefan Lendi
domiciled in Mols, from Quarten Active mandates: Malerei Lendi GmbH Connected persons: Kenneth Mast, Esther Lendi You can stay up to date through "Stefan Lendi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Lendi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Lendi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Lendi"
|
|
Stefan Lendi
domiciled in Sullens, from Mels Active mandates: Lendigital Sàrl Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Stefan Lendi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Lendi"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Stefan Lendi", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Stefan Lendi"
|
Places where people with the name Stefan Lendi live
Sectors in which people with the name Stefan Lendi work
Painter
IT services
Painter
IT services
Private persons with the name Stefan Lendi
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Stefan Lendi
Publication number: 7029782, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Lendi Betriebs GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.031.233-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 29.12.2009, S. 43, Publ. 5418620). Gemäss Erklärung vom 01.07.2010 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lendi, Matthias, von Chur und Tamins, in Erlenbach ZH, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 49'000.00;
auditpoint ag revisionsgesellschaft (CH-020.3.033.724-2), in Dübendorf, Revisionsstelle;
Lendi, Stefanie, von Chur, in Erlenbach ZH, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fairinvest AG (CH-020.3.034.007-6), in Zumikon, Gesellschafterin, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 49'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00;
Einarsson, Agnar Mar, von Schlatt TG, in Dübendorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5418620, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2005, S. 22, publizierten Eintrags Nr. 17'263 vom 21.06.2005. Lendi Betriebs GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.031.233-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 18.12.2009, S. 33, Publ. 5401382).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lendi, Stefanie, von Chur, in Erlenbach ZH, Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [nicht: Lendi, Stafanie].
Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Malerei Boos & Lendi, in Walenstadt, Betrieb eines Malergeschäftes usw. Kollektivgesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2002, S. 13, Publ. 6538).
Firma neu:
Malerei Boos & Lendi, Inhaber Stefan Lendi.
Rechtsform neu:
Einzelfirma.
Zweck neu:
Baumalerei. Diese Gesellschaft hat sich infolge Todes des Gesellschafters Luz Boos, dessen Unterschrift erloschen ist, aufgelöst. Die Firma ist erloschen. Der Gesellschafter Stefan Lendi führt im Sinne von Art. 579 OR das Geschäft als Einzelfirma unter der Firma 'Malerei Boos & Lendi, Inhaber Stefan Lendi', in Walenstadt, fort. [gestrichen: Beginn der Kollektivgesellschaft: 1.1.2002].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Boos, Luz, von Amden, in Walenstadt, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lendi, Stefan, von Quarten, in Mols (Quarten), Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lendi, Esther, von Quarten, in Mols (Quarten), mit Einzelprokura.